Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 776 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14182 Week
» 67198 Month
» 186725 Year
» 3213578 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75164 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8020 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68020 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Works Number |
2752 |
To Service |
During 09/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/06/1963 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys |
Information |
Sold to NCB on withdrawal |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
5w/e |
13/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/06/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1948 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75164 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2752 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8020 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68020 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68020 |
|
|