Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71506 |
m/e |
04/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8026 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68026 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
Works Number |
1783 |
To Service |
During 04/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/03/1961 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1945 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
41J |
|
Langwith Junction |
4w/e |
19/07/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/03/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
4w/e |
14/07/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/03/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1948 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71506 Built at Hudswell Clarke, Works Number 1783 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8026 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68026 |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
17/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68026 |
|
|