Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2990 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16396 Week
» 69412 Month
» 188939 Year
» 3215792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75281 |
m/e |
04/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8032 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68032 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
7211 |
To Service |
During 04/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/05/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75281 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7211 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8032 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68032 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
25/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68032 |
|
|