Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1757 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15163 Week
» 68179 Month
» 187706 Year
» 3214559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75321 |
m/e |
07/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8036 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68036 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
5311 |
To Service |
During 07/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/05/1964 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75321 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5311 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8036 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68036 |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
25/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68036 |
|
|