Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1098 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18901 Week
» 71917 Month
» 191444 Year
» 3218297 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75330 |
m/e |
08/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8045 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68045 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
5320 |
To Service |
During 08/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/09/1963 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1945 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
DAR |
|
Darlington |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
56B |
|
Ardsley |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DAR |
Darlington |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
5w/e |
04/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
5w/e |
10/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1949 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1960 |
Ardsley MPD |
J94s 68008/11/5/45 have been transferred for working the E & W Yorkshire Union branch from Lofthouse in place of J52s 68869/75 which have been placed in store-the last two in main line stock. |
SLS/196103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75330 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5320 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8045 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68045 |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68045 |
|
|