Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71467 |
m/e |
09/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8060 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68060 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
Works Number |
1785 |
To Service |
During 09/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/05/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1949 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/09/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Roundhouse) |
On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. |
SLS/196410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71467 Built at Hudswell Clarke, Works Number 1785 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8060 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68060 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
24/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68060 |
|
|