31/05/1949 |
Darlington Works |
New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. |
SLS/194907 |
18/01/1964 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. |
SLS/196402 |
01/02/1964 |
Branch line news (Scrap Yard) |
Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. |
SLS/196403 |