Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1074 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18877 Week
» 71893 Month
» 191420 Year
» 3218273 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71472 |
m/e |
12/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8065 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68065 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
Works Number |
1790 |
To Service |
During 12/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/12/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
EXLOAN |
6F |
Bidston |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1950 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71472 Built at Hudswell Clarke, Works Number 1790 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8065 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68065 |
|
|
01/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bidston (6F) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68065 |
|
|