Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1799 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19602 Week
» 72618 Month
» 192145 Year
» 3218998 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71475 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8068 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68068 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
Works Number |
1793 |
To Service |
During 02/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/05/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
17C |
Rowsley |
5w/e |
04/08/1962 |
ALLOC |
16C |
Derby |
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
08/05/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1948 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1946 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71475 Built at Hudswell Clarke, Works Number 1793 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8068 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68068 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68068 |
|
|