Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 71476 m/e 02/1946
LNER (1946) 8069 m/e 07/1946
BR 68069 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Hudswell Clarke
Works Number 1794
To Service During 02/1946
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 16 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster 4w/e 08/02/1958
41J Langwith Junction w/e 29/04/1961
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 13/05/1961
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1948 Extended bunker fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1946 To Service To service as WD Number 71476
Built at Hudswell Clarke, Works Number 1794
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8069    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
12/1948 Modification Modification: Extended bunker fitted    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68069    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68069    

prev prev