Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 983 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18786 Week
» 71802 Month
» 191329 Year
» 3218182 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71486 |
m/e |
09/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8070 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68070 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
7295 |
To Service |
During 09/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/03/1963 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys |
Information |
Sold to Sir Lindsay Parkinson & Co., April 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
DON |
Doncaster |
on |
01/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
03/09/1960 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
08/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
3w/e |
14/07/1962 |
ALLOC |
41F |
Mexborough |
2w/e |
15/12/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/03/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1948 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71486 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7295 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8070 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68070 |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
19/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68070 |
|
|