Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 62 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17865 Week
» 70881 Month
» 190408 Year
» 3217261 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71532 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8071 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68071 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
LOAN |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
LOAN |
8E |
Brunswick |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
on |
04/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
5w/e |
27/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1949 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71532 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2186 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8071 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68071 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
07/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68071 |
|
|