Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 132 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17935 Week
» 70951 Month
» 190478 Year
» 3217331 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71535 |
m/e |
12/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8074 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68074 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1945 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
03/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1950 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1945 |
Wellingborough |
During the last two weeks in December, there were numerous strangers in this area, helping with the Christmas workings when some expresses ran in as many as six parts-an unprecedented occurrence on the Midland Division. Locos noted included 324, 931 (20B); 1181 (19A), 2339 (21A), 2814 (2D), 4017 (19C), 4843 (22A), 4916, 5070 (1A), 5381 (5A), 5403 (5A), 5410 (8A), 5657 (22A), 8127 (20A), 8162 (20C), 8373 (4A). 2129, 2518 (13D), and 7312 (13B) have been seen working through light en route for shops. W.D. tanks 71473 an 71535 were dead in the loco yard on 23/12, but disappeared next day. |
SLS/194604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71535 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2189 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8074 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68074 |
|
|
07/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68074 |
|
|