Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 71462 m/e 04/1946
LNER (1946) 8076 m/e 06/1946
BR 68076 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Works Number 2211
To Service During 04/1946
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1960
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40E Colwick w/e 13/12/1958
   Withdrawn 02/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   02/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1949 Extended bunker fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1946 To Service To service as WD Number 71462
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2211
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8076    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
01/1949 Modification Modification: Extended bunker fitted    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68076    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68076    

prev prev