Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 226 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 226 Week
» 11773 Month
» 411455 Year
» 488042 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 71466   01/1947
LNER (1946) 8077   02/1947
BR 68077   08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Works Number 2215
To Service During 01/1947
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 15 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys
Information Loco was sold to the NCB for further use on 29th December 1962

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey w/e 24/01/1959
40F Boston w/e 15/07/1961
40E Colwick w/e 30/06/1962
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK IMM Immingham 30/01/1947
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 40E Colwick 3w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1949 Extended bunker fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1947 To Service To service as WD Number 71466
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2215
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 8077    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
08/1949 Modification Modification: Extended bunker fitted    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68077    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68077    

prev prev