Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 800 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5401 Week
» 16948 Month
» 416630 Year
» 493217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 62005   10/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26609
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 10/06/1949 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Sat 30/12/1967 off Holbeck (MR) (55A)
Service Life 18 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for private preservation by Lord Garnock 30/5/69

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) 10/06/1949
HTN Heaton 25/09/1949
51A Darlington 06/07/1952
56B Ardsley 14/06/1959
50A York (North) 30/08/1959
52F Blyth (North) 13/03/1966
52H Tyne Dock 28/05/1967
55A Holbeck (MR) 10/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW DAR Darlington 10/06/1949
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 26/03/1966
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 17/06/1967
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 07/10/1967
WDN 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 16/12/1949 21/12/1949 6 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 28/08/1951 26/09/1951 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1953 15/06/1953 35 days General  
Darlington Works 30/06/1954 07/07/1954 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 18/09/1954 23/09/1954 6 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 18/10/1955 12/11/1955 26 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/09/1958 23/10/1958 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1958 11/11/1958 12 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/10/1960 25/10/1960 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 03/01/1961 02/02/1961 31 days General  
Darlington Works 13/11/1964 23/01/1965 72 days General  
Darlington Works 25/01/1965 27/01/1965 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/02/1965 10/02/1965 9 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 62005
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26609
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
   
25/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
16/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1949. Dep: 21/12/1949.    
28/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1951. Dep: 26/09/1951.    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
12/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1953. Dep: 15/06/1953.    
30/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1954. Dep: 07/07/1954.    
18/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 23/09/1954.    
18/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955.    
24/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958.    
31/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1958. Dep: 11/11/1958.    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
30/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
10/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 25/10/1960.    
03/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1961. Dep: 02/02/1961.    
13/11/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1964. Dep: 23/01/1965.    
25/01/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1965. Dep: 27/01/1965.    
02/02/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1965. Dep: 10/02/1965.    
13/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
28/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
10/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 62005 from Holbeck (MR) (55A)    

prev prev