Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 62012 on 01/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26616
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 01/07/1949 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Wed 17/05/1967 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During y/e 1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 21/7/67. Cut up 28/8/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 01/07/1949
31B March on 21/05/1950
65A Eastfield on 10/02/1952
63D Fort William on 01/06/1952
52d Alnmouth on 02/12/1962
50A York (North) on 06/09/1964
52G Sunderland on 30/04/1967
   Withdrawn on 17/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW GOR Gorton on 01/07/1949
ALLOC 31B March w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 65A Eastfield w/e 10/02/1952
ALLOC 63D Fort William 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 52DALN   w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 52DALN   7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 50A York (North) 5w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 17/05/1967
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 20/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/05/1951 15/06/1951 26 days General  
Cowlairs Works 16/05/1952 1 day Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 12/11/1953 11/12/1953 30 days General  
Cowlairs Works 29/04/1954 16/06/1954 49 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/08/1956 21/09/1956 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 28/02/1957 02/03/1957 3 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 30/06/1958 02/07/1958 3 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1958 21/11/1958 22 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1959 21/11/1959 25 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/01/1960 10/02/1960 22 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 20/02/1965 15/04/1965 55 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). SLS/194910
30/06/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 62004/05(10/6), 62006(15/6), 62007(17/6), 62008(21/6), 62009(23/6), 62010(27/6), 62011(29/6) and 62012(W/E 2/7). Works' Nos. checked are:-Nos. 62001-12(26605-16/49). SLS/194908
03/07/1949 Eastfield MPD On 3/7, new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's, Nos. 62005, 62007-12, were on the shed, and a number of ex L.N.E.R. locomotives were observed with the Power Classification painted on the cab sides. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 62012
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26616
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
   
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fort William (63D)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d)    
06/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
30/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
17/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 62012 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev