|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 10/10/1950 | 17/10/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1952 | 24/01/1952 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1954 | 09/04/1954 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 21 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1956 | 29/03/1956 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1956 | 12/11/1956 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1958 | 22/07/1958 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1961 | 20/04/1961 | 35 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). | SLS/194910 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62013 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26617 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950. | ||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 24/01/1952. | ||
10/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1954. Dep: 09/04/1954. | ||
10/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954. | ||
01/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1956. Dep: 29/03/1956. | ||
22/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 12/11/1956. | ||
13/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1958. Dep: 22/07/1958. | ||
09/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
24/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
17/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961. | ||
29/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62013 from Frodingham (36C) | ||
1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |