|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1951 | 04/04/1951 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1953 | 05/02/1953 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1954 | 19/08/1954 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1954 | 07/01/1955 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1959 | 21/07/1959 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1962 | 24/03/1962 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1962 | 20/12/1962 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). | SLS/194910 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62014 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26618 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) |
||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
06/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951. | ||
14/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1953. Dep: 05/02/1953. | ||
09/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 19/08/1954. | ||
08/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1954. Dep: 07/01/1955. | ||
23/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1959. Dep: 21/07/1959. | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
22/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1962. Dep: 24/03/1962. | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1962. Dep: 20/12/1962. | ||
1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
06/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62014 from Frodingham (36C) |