|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1950 | 23/08/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1951 | 08/11/1951 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1952 | 27/03/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1954 | 09/02/1954 | 27 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1954 | 20/09/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1956 | 26/09/1956 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1958 | 20/03/1958 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1960 | 30/06/1960 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1962 | 23/11/1962 | 22 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/07/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62019 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26623 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 23/08/1950. | ||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 08/11/1951. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 27/03/1952. | ||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
25/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 09/02/1954. | ||
02/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1954. Dep: 20/09/1954. | ||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
29/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1956. Dep: 26/09/1956. | ||
19/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1958. Dep: 20/03/1958. | ||
09/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 30/06/1960. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
17/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962. | ||
1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62019 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |