Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 272 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2837 Week
» 1575 Month
» 415896 Year
» 1637461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 62021 on 02/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26625
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sun 02/08/1949 to Blaydon (BLA)
Withdrawal Sun 30/10/1966 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Scrapping During y/e 1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 4/67. Cut up 29/5/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon (New) on 02/08/1949
52A Gateshead on 06/05/1962
52d Alnmouth on 25/11/1962
52G Sunderland on 19/06/1966
52H Tyne Dock on 23/10/1966
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BLA Blaydon on 02/08/1949
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 52DALN   3w/e 24/11/1962
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 16/07/1966
WDN   on 30/10/1966
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 05/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 21/11/1949 23/11/1949 3 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 20/03/1951 13/04/1951 25 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/09/1952 27/10/1952 28 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/08/1954 15/09/1954 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/07/1956 18/08/1956 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/07/1957 19/07/1957 3 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 24/02/1958 26/02/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1958 24/04/1958 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/02/1960 12/03/1960 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/01/1962 17/02/1962 31 days General  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). SLS/194910
28/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/08/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 62021
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26625
Allocated to Blaydon (BLA)
   
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
25/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d)    
19/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
23/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
30/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 62021 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev