Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 62030 on 22/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26634
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 22/08/1949 to Blaydon (BLA)
Withdrawal Mon 09/08/1965 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During y/e 1965
Service Life 15 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth 12/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon (New) on 22/08/1949
52A Gateshead on 06/05/1962
52d Alnmouth on 04/11/1962
52G Sunderland on 28/02/1965
   Withdrawn on 09/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BLA Blaydon on 22/08/1949
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 52Da   5w/e 10/11/1962
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 27/03/1965
WDN   on 09/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 30/12/1949 06/01/1950 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 20/06/1951 23/07/1951 34 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/03/1953 24/04/1953 26 days General  
Gateshead Works 01/12/1953 08/12/1953 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 04/08/1954 09/08/1954 6 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1955 18/02/1955 31 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/04/1956 09/04/1956 7 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 27/12/1956 24/01/1957 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/12/1958 17/01/1959 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/12/1960 28/01/1961 29 days General  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). SLS/194910
04/01/1959 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 62030
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26634
Allocated to Blaydon (BLA)
   
30/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950.    
20/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1951. Dep: 23/07/1951.    
30/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953.    
01/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 08/12/1953.    
04/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1954. Dep: 09/08/1954.    
19/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 18/02/1955.    
03/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1956. Dep: 09/04/1956.    
27/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 24/01/1957.    
16/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 17/01/1959.    
31/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961.    
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
04/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d)    
28/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 62030 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev