Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 62042 on 07/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26646
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 07/10/1949 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967 off West Hartlepool (51C)
Scrapping During y/e 1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)
Service Life 17 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Dinsdale 10/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 07/10/1949
51E Stockton on 12/02/1950
51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
50A York (North) on 17/06/1962
52G Sunderland on 30/04/1967
51C West Hartlepool on 28/05/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW DAR Darlington on 07/10/1949
ALLOC 51E Stockton w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 20/05/1967
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 17/06/1967
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 22/05/1950 24/05/1950 3 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 24/07/1951 01/08/1951 9 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/06/1952 18/07/1952 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/06/1954 26/07/1954 27 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1956 14/11/1956 29 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/12/1956 04/12/1956 4 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/09/1958 18/10/1958 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/01/1960 30/01/1960 27 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/04/1961 03/05/1961 33 days General  
Darlington Works 19/01/1965 12/03/1965 53 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62040 (3/10), 62041 (6/10), 62042 (7/10), 62043 (11/10), 62044 (13/10), 62045 (14/10), 62046/48 (21/10), 62047 (20/10), 62049 (25/10), 62050 (27/10), 62051 (2/11), and 62052 (4/11), while No. 62055 was 'road-steamed' at the Works on 1/11. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62040-42 (26644-46/49), 62045-52 (26649-56/49). No. 62051 is the first of the Order to have the crest on the tender and as yet none have appeared with the Power Classification on the cab. SLS/194912
23/04/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/10/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 62042
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26646
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
   
12/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
30/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
28/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 62042 from West Hartlepool (51C)    

prev prev