|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/05/1950 | 04/05/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1951 | 21/09/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1952 | 21/02/1952 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1954 | 06/01/1955 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1957 | 19/01/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1960 | 07/12/1960 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1962 | 13/11/1962 | 23 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1963 | 26/11/1963 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1964 | 13/01/1965 | 55 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62040 (3/10), 62041 (6/10), 62042 (7/10), 62043 (11/10), 62044 (13/10), 62045 (14/10), 62046/48 (21/10), 62047 (20/10), 62049 (25/10), 62050 (27/10), 62051 (2/11), and 62052 (4/11), while No. 62055 was 'road-steamed' at the Works on 1/11. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62040-42 (26644-46/49), 62045-52 (26649-56/49). No. 62051 is the first of the Order to have the crest on the tender and as yet none have appeared with the Power Classification on the cab. | SLS/194912 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/10/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62048 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26652 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
||
02/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 04/05/1950. | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
01/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
17/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
19/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1951. Dep: 21/09/1951. | ||
28/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1952. Dep: 21/02/1952. | ||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
01/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1954. Dep: 06/01/1955. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
03/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1957. Dep: 19/01/1957. | ||
13/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. | ||
01/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
09/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1960. Dep: 07/12/1960. | ||
22/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1962. Dep: 13/11/1962. | ||
09/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1963. Dep: 26/11/1963. | ||
20/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1964. Dep: 13/01/1965. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
13/03/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
19/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62048 from West Hartlepool (51C) |