|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1923 | 12/05/1923 | 38 days | Heavy | New chimney to G E gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 81 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4632 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1927 | 24/02/1928 | 67 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1932 | 08/10/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1935 | 16/02/1935 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to K2 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1940 | 28/09/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1945 | 09/08/1945 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1945 | 26/01/1946 | 169 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1722 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1947 | 17/12/1947 | 88 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 63 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61722 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1951 | 07/07/1951 | 128 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1953 | 18/12/1953 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/08/1954 | 20/08/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 48 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1951 | \"K2\" runs hot | 'K2' No. 61722 recently ran hot near Milngavie Junction, and was immediately removed from its train and placed in a siding. 'C16' (6)7488 happened to be coming light from Milngavie at the time and was put on to the 'West Highland' to Queen St. The train was delayed only nine minutes, through quick action on the part of all concerned. The brasses of 61722 had almost ceased to exist when she was finally got into the siding. | SLS/195111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1632 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1373 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
||
25/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/04/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923. Work undertaken: New chimney to G E gauge |
||
05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
12/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4632 |
||
17/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1927. Dep: 24/02/1928. | ||
15/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. | ||
13/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932. | ||
09/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935. | ||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to K2 |
||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. | ||
07/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. | ||
13/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. | ||
05/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/07/1945. Dep: 09/08/1945. | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1722 |
||
21/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1947. Dep: 17/12/1947. | ||
20/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61722 |
||
02/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1951. Dep: 07/07/1951. | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
24/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
01/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. | ||
07/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 18/12/1953. | ||
13/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954. | ||
1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
31/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. | ||
22/09/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61722 from Parkhead (65C) |