Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1633 m/e 02/1913
LNER (1924) 4633   12/07/1924
LNER (1946) 1723   22/09/1946
BR 61723   26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K102/1913
K2/101/1933
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 272
Works Number 1374
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 02/1913 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Wed 04/11/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 02/1913
STR Stratford m/e 05/1924
CLK Colwick 01/07/1925
MEX Mexborough 14/01/1931
DON Doncaster 18/01/1933
MEX Mexborough 06/03/1933
DON Doncaster 11/12/1935
MAR March 04/11/1937
DON Doncaster 16/02/1938
FRO Frodingham 04/07/1943
DON Doncaster 25/07/1943
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 30/07/1945
ARD Ardsley 30/12/1945
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 30/06/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
   Withdrawn 04/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley m/e 31/01/1946
WDN   04/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 08/05/1922 17/06/1922 41 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/08/1923 13/10/1923 61 days General
As 1633N
 
Doncaster Works 02/06/1924 12/07/1924 41 days Heavy
New chimney to G E gauge
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4633
 
Doncaster Works 09/12/1925 22/04/1926 135 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/08/1928 06/10/1928 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/12/1930 17/01/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/11/1932 21/01/1933 57 days General
Rebuilt to K2
 
Doncaster Works 11/05/1935 08/06/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/03/1937 24/04/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/12/1938 14/01/1939 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/11/1940 30/11/1940 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/05/1941 21/06/1941 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 25/07/1942 19/09/1942 57 days General  
Cowlairs Works 01/10/1944 11/11/1944 42 days General  
Cowlairs Works 26/06/1945 21/07/1945 26 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 01/11/1945 08/12/1945 38 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 28/11/1946 11/04/1947 135 days General  
Cowlairs Works 10/01/1949 26/03/1949 76 days General
Renumbered to BR 61723
 
Cowlairs Works 28/03/1951 23/06/1951 88 days General  
Cowlairs Works 06/06/1952 17/07/1952 42 days Heavy Casual  
Cowlairs Works 28/09/1953 28/11/1953 62 days General  
Cowlairs Works 04/10/1955 03/12/1955 61 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 08/06/1956 25/06/1956 18 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1913 To Service To service as GNR Number 1633
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1374
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
   
08/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922.    
14/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
As 1633N
   
05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
02/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/06/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
New chimney to G E gauge
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4633
   
01/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1925. Dep: 22/04/1926.    
18/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928.    
13/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931.    
14/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to K2
   
18/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935.    
11/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.    
04/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
16/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939.    
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.    
24/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941.    
25/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942.    
04/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.    
26/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945.    
30/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
01/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.    
30/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
30/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1723    
28/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1946. Dep: 11/04/1947.    
10/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61723
   
28/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951.    
06/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1952. Dep: 17/07/1952.    
28/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.    
04/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.    
08/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1956. Dep: 25/06/1956.    
04/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61723 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev