Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1634 m/e 02/1913
LNER (1924) 4634   05/07/1924
LNER (1946) 1724   26/07/1946
BR 61724   11/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K102/1913
K2/106/1931
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 272
Works Number 1375
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 02/1913 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Fri 03/01/1958 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping During y/e 1958
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) m/e 02/1913
STR Stratford m/e 05/1924
CLK Colwick 22/06/1925
NWE New England 23/08/1927
DON Doncaster 10/05/1929
MEX Mexborough 16/05/1929
DON Doncaster 07/12/1935
FRO Frodingham 04/07/1943
DON Doncaster 25/07/1943
CLK Colwick 23/08/1946
IMM Immingham 27/04/1947
41A Sheffield Darnall 10/07/1955
   Withdrawn 03/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham 27/04/1947
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   03/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/10/1921 04/03/1922 126 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/05/1923 30/06/1923 51 days General
New chimney to G E gauge
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1924 05/07/1924 143 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4634
 
Doncaster Works 22/03/1926 19/07/1926 120 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/06/1928 25/08/1928 70 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1931 20/06/1931 85 days General
Rebuilt to K2
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1931 25/07/1931 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/12/1933 06/01/1934 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/03/1936 25/04/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1938 12/03/1938 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/09/1939 14/10/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/11/1940 21/12/1940 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/12/1942 09/01/1943 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 22/11/1944 30/12/1944 39 days General  
Cowlairs Works 1945 10/01/1945   Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 05/08/1945 08/09/1945 35 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/09/1945 20/10/1945 31 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 26/10/1946 30/11/1946 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 01/01/1950 11/02/1950 42 days General
Renumbered to BR 61724
 
Cowlairs Works 18/06/1952 08/07/1952 21 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/10/1952 05/11/1952 36 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 04/03/1954 17/04/1954 45 days General  
Cowlairs Works 04/05/1954 12/05/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 20/05/1954 22/05/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 16/11/1957   No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1913 To Service To service as GNR Number 1634
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1375
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
   
30/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1921. Dep: 04/03/1922.    
11/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
New chimney to G E gauge
   
14/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4634
   
05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
22/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1926. Dep: 19/07/1926.    
23/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
17/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928.    
10/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to K2
   
04/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931.    
02/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934.    
07/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936.    
26/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.    
02/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.    
23/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940.    
12/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.    
04/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944.    
1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 10/01/1945.    
05/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.    
20/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.    
26/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1724    
23/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61724
   
18/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1952. Dep: 08/07/1952.    
01/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952.    
04/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954.    
04/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954.    
20/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954.    
10/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
16/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/11/1957.    
03/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61724 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev