|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1921 | 08/10/1921 | 115 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1924 | 16/08/1924 | 178 days | General | New chimney to G E gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4638 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1926 | 10/02/1927 | 95 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 66 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1931 | 01/08/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1935 | 08/02/1936 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt to K2 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1937 | 06/03/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1938 | 21/05/1938 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1943 | 06/02/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 31 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/05/1947 | 01/11/1947 | 176 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 72 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61728 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 20 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 53 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1954 | 27/09/1954 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/01/1957 | 08/03/1957 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1638 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1379 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) |
||
16/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921. | ||
21/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924. Work undertaken: New chimney to G E gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4638 |
||
08/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1926. Dep: 10/02/1927. | ||
18/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. | ||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931. | ||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. | ||
01/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 08/02/1936. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to K2 |
||
13/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937. | ||
07/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938. | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. | ||
09/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943. | ||
01/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
29/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1728 | ||
23/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
10/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947. | ||
07/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61728 |
||
09/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. | ||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
03/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. | ||
19/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1954. Dep: 27/09/1954. | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
06/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61728 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |