Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 870 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6679 Week
» 13863 Month
» 321844 Year
» 1206225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1644 m/e 04/1914
LNER (1924) 4644   05/07/1924
LNER (1946) 1734   26/05/1946
BR 61734   12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/104/1914
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 277
Works Number 1430
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 04/1914 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Wed 25/07/1956 off Keith (61C)
Scrapping During y/e 1956
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs?

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 04/1914
CAM Cambridge m/e 07/1924
STR Stratford 15/10/1927
KX Kings Cross 03/01/1929
NOR Norwich Thorpe 09/10/1930
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 17/10/1930
KX Kings Cross 28/12/1930
MAR March 02/02/1932
NOR Norwich Thorpe 18/10/1935
MAR March 18/02/1945
STR Stratford 02/10/1947
65A Eastfield 03/06/1951
62C Dunfermline Upper 10/02/1952
62A Thornton Junction 16/11/1952
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 10/05/1953
61C Keith 07/07/1954
   Withdrawn 25/07/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 02/10/1947
ALLOC 65A Eastfield w/e 03/06/1951
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 10/07/1954
WDN   25/07/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1914 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7255)
05/07/1924 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7268)
02/1928 Westinghouse Brake fitted
04/01/1929 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7255)
17/09/1932 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7603)
11/06/1938 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8562)
10/08/1945 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8825)
19/01/1952 Westinghouse Brake removed
01/11/1952 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21155)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/06/1921 01/10/1921 123 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/02/1924 05/07/1924 136 days General
New chimney fitted
Boiler number 7268 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4644
 
Doncaster Works 22/01/1926 10/04/1926 79 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/11/1926 18/12/1926 41 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 1928 02/1928   Light Repair
Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 14/11/1928 04/01/1929 52 days General
Boiler number 7255 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 30/08/1930 11/10/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/07/1932 17/09/1932 50 days General
Boiler number 7603 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 06/04/1935 04/05/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/05/1938 11/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 8562 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 13/05/1939 22/07/1939 71 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 05/04/1941 03/05/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/07/1943 14/08/1943 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 28/06/1945 10/08/1945 44 days General
Boiler number 8825 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 20/06/1947 20/09/1947 93 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 05/1948 12/06/1948   Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61734
 
Cowlairs Works 07/01/1951 10/02/1951 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 1952 19/01/1952   Light Casual
Side window cab fitted. Westinghouse brake removed
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 12/09/1952 01/11/1952 51 days General
Boiler number 21155 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 02/06/1954 08/07/1954 37 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1914 To Service To service as GNR Number 1644
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1430
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
01/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1921. Dep: 01/10/1921.    
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
New chimney fitted
Boiler number 7268 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4644
   
07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
22/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926.    
08/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926.    
15/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1928. Dep: ?/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
14/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1928. Dep: 04/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7255 (Diagram 3)
   
03/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930.    
09/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
17/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
28/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
02/02/1932 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7603 (Diagram 3)
   
06/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935.    
18/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8562 (Diagram 3)
   
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.    
05/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.    
10/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.    
18/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
28/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1945. Dep: 10/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8825 (Diagram 3)
   
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1734    
20/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/06/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947.    
02/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61734
   
07/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.    
03/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1952. Dep: 19/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Side window cab fitted. Westinghouse brake removed
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
10/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
12/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21155 (Diagram 3)
   
16/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
10/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
02/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 08/07/1954.    
07/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
25/07/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 61734 from Keith (61C)    

prev prev