Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 553 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6760 Week
» 4273 Month
» 232157 Year
» 1453722 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1647 m/e 05/1914
LNER (1924) 4647   04/10/1924
LNER (1946) 1737   13/04/1946
BR 61737   09/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/105/1914
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 277
Works Number 1433
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 05/1914 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Thu 22/11/1956 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping During y/e 1957
Service Life 42 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Kilmamock

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 05/1914
STR Stratford m/e 1925
STR Southend Victoria   21/12/1929
STR Stratford 11/01/1930
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 02/10/1931
STR Stratford 22/12/1931
NOR Norwich Thorpe 12/12/1941
MAR March 19/02/1945
NOR Norwich Thorpe 07/02/1947
STR Stratford 22/10/1947
NWE New England 17/10/1949
30A Stratford 26/03/1950
38A Colwick 05/10/1952
41A Sheffield Darnall 26/06/1955
   Withdrawn 22/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 07/02/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   22/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1914 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7258)
04/10/1924 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7683)
14/09/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
23/08/1930 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7453)
06/05/1933 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7255)
31/07/1937 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8560)
29/04/1945 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8757)
11/08/1953 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21187)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1943 Cambridge Area Notes (By The Cambridge University Railway Club) Interest in the Cambridge area continues to centre upon the procession of locomotives to and from Stratford works. These usually spend some time on the dead road at Cambridge shed before proceeding on their journey; luckily they are then easily visible from the public highway. Only one 'O4' has been so reported recently-6502, which passed through on 31/8, newly repainted. This seems rather a roundabout way to return to Woodford-may the practice continue!
There has been a recent tendency for 'E4's' and 'J15's' to be returned to Norwich via Cambridge; and 7791, 7497, 7516 & 7825 have been seen. Nos. 7360(LIN), 7323(NWE) and 7400(FRO) have been noted returning from Stratford-the former stayed in Cambridge for about three weeks. 7340(BSE) (Bury) has also been to Cambridge and worked in the yard for about a month, presumably on loan, as 7011 & 7190 have gone to Stratford for repair; and the stud of shunting tanks has been further depleted by the loan of 7256 to KL.
No. 2095 was in Cambridge yards on 21/9 presumably returning to Darlington. Nos. 4355, 3400, 089 an 092 have recently been in Cambridge for repairs, whilst 065 was in the yard on 18/9 and probably has gone to Stratford. Light repairs to South Lynn engines are often performed in Cambridge-usually at the back of the running shed unless the lift shop gear is required. This practice results in little check being possible on the rarest of our visitors!
Nos. 8883/7/99 have returned from Stratford rebuilt as class D16/3; 8896 returned not so rebuilt. 8899 is the first of the 8890 series to be rebuilt. 8887 has been transferred from KL to CAM on rebuilding. A number of 'D15's' can be seen still-8867(COL) is almost a daily visitor, and spent some time recently in the lift shops; 8881/90/3/5/6(KL) of King's Lynn often appear; 8892/7(BSE) of Bury appear on most days whilst 7764 is stationed at Cambridge.
The large stud of Passenger locomotives attached results in a certain dullness of workings. Duties on the Liverpool St. line are split between Cambridge and Stratford; there is one regular Colchester working via Haverhill and also one from Ipswich and King's Lynn and two from Bury. Certain other trains, especially those from March via St. Ives, are often powered from March or King's Lynn sheds. Norwich locomotives appear irregularly-most frequently 'Sandringhams,' which appear sometimes on Stratford turns.
Recently a certain amount of variety has crept into the Liverpool St. workings as 'K3's' and 'K2's' have appeared fairly frequently. On 23/8/43 Nos. 4647, 2459 an 163 appeared on successive trains. On 19/9 the first part of the 2.20 p.m. ex Liverpool St. came in behind 2816(IPS) and the second behind 4631 (NOR).
The majority of trains on the King's Cross line continue to be hauled by 'C1' Atlantics. There are three turns on which Pacifics and 'V2's' appear fairly regularly-almost invariably King's Cross locomotives. There is a certain amount of variety with the 'Atlantics'; though those from sheds North of Peterborough are very rare. Two trains are usually hauled by Cambridge locos. almost always 'B17's' or 'Clauds.' Recently 2844(NOR) worked one of these, and must have been a very rare visitor at King's Cross. The turntable at Cambridge is now under repair and, as a result, the big engines do not work in as they cannot be turned on the LMS table. Cambridge 'Claud' workings compensate for the increase in strain on the GN sheds.
March is, of course, the main source of Goods locos. and its 'O2's' and 0-6-0's are abundant. Since the arrival of the American locomotives, the 'K3's' have become less common though the K2's' the more so. On a recent afternoon there were four types of 2-8-0 in the yard-'02'; USA; 'Austerity' (one from LNE and one from LMS); and a standard LMS freight built by SR. Later one of the Vulcan-built 'Austerities' came in (the other 2 were by N.B. Loco), followed by an 'O4.'
The LNW trains, as ever, specialise in bringing us Bletchley 'Princes,' 2-6-4T and 0-8-0. There is one regular 2D turn per day. Occasionally standard 0-6-0's (usually from the Midland division) appear and also standard 2-8-0's from 1A. Recently 4-4-0 420 (2A) appeared on a passenger train; another recent visitor has been Compound No. 900. On the Midland trains, Kettering supplies a variety of 2F 0-6-0's which, together with 2-4-0 No. 20216, appear to be well suited to this type of work on local passenger trains.
SLS/194401

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 25/08/1921 17/12/1921 115 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/05/1924 04/10/1924 144 days General
New chimney to GE gauge
Boiler number 7683 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4647
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1926 22/10/1926 130 days General  
Stratford Works 07/09/1927 14/09/1927 8 days Unclassified
Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 27/09/1928 15/11/1928 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/07/1930 23/08/1930 50 days General
Boiler number 7453 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 25/03/1933 06/05/1933 43 days General
Boiler number 7255 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 13/04/1935 25/05/1935 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/07/1937 31/07/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 16/04/1938 07/05/1938 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1940 11/01/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/05/1943 05/06/1943 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 08/04/1945 29/04/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 8757 (Diagram 3)
 
Stratford Works 15/06/1945 07/07/1945 23 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 03/11/1945 08/12/1945 36 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 22/03/1946 13/07/1946 114 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1737
 
Cowlairs Works 14/07/1950 19/09/1950 68 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 61737
 
Cowlairs Works 19/12/1951 01/01/1952 14 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 01/07/1953 11/08/1953 42 days General
Boiler number 21187 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 07/10/1953 27/11/1953 52 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 07/05/1954 26/06/1954 51 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 23/09/1954 16/10/1954 24 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 14/11/1956   No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1914 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1647
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1433
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
25/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1921. Dep: 17/12/1921.    
14/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 04/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
New chimney to GE gauge
Boiler number 7683 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4647
   
1925 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
15/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1926. Dep: 22/10/1926.    
07/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1927. Dep: 14/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
27/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1928. Dep: 15/11/1928.    
21/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR)    
11/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7453 (Diagram 3)
   
02/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
22/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7255 (Diagram 3)
   
13/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935.    
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3)
   
16/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1938. Dep: 07/05/1938.    
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941.    
12/12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.    
19/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
08/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1945. Dep: 29/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8757 (Diagram 3)
   
15/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945.    
03/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.    
22/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1737
   
07/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
22/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
17/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/07/1950. Dep: 19/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61737
   
19/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 01/01/1952.    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 11/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21187 (Diagram 3)
   
07/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1953. Dep: 27/11/1953.    
07/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.    
23/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.    
26/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
14/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/11/1956.    
22/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 61737 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev