|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1922 | 18/11/1922 | 109 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1924 | 28/03/1925 | 104 days | General | Boiler number 7451 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4651 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1927 | 15/07/1927 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1929 | 18/05/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7263 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21113 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1938 | 30/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21129 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1941 | 05/07/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 18/11/1943 | General | Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 09/09/1944 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 28/10/1944 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 16/03/1944 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 25/02/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9349 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 11/09/1948 | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61741 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1949 | 16/11/1949 | 64 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1950 | 30/12/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 21170 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1951 | 27/01/1951 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/01/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
10/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 24 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 32 days | General | WPU gear removed Boiler number 21147 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1959 | 17/12/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | Leeds Area | Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). | SLS/194601 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1651 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1467 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
02/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922. | ||
15/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1924. Dep: 28/03/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7451 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4651 |
||
03/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1927. Dep: 15/07/1927. | ||
13/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7263 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. | ||
12/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. | ||
25/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21113 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. | ||
28/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
01/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21129 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. | ||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
31/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 18/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3) |
||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 16/03/1944. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. | ||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1741 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9349 (Diagram 3) |
||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61741 |
||
14/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/09/1949. Dep: 16/11/1949. | ||
09/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21170 (Diagram 3) |
||
04/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951. | ||
28/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
23/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
04/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. | ||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. | ||
12/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1954. | ||
09/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: WPU gear removed Boiler number 21147 (Diagram 3) |
||
05/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
28/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. | ||
14/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1959. Dep: 17/12/1959. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
11/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61741 from Kittybrewster (61A) |