Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 854 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4402 Week
» 5292 Month
» 313273 Year
» 1197654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1652 m/e 05/1916
LNER (1924) 4652   09/08/1924
LNER (1946) 1742   24/03/1946
BR 61742   02/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/105/1916
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 281
Works Number 1469
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 05/1916 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Tue 15/05/1962 off New England (34E)
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 46 yrs , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into DO for cut up 15/5/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Southend Victoria   07/1907
ARD Ardsley (New) m/e 05/1916
MAR March m/e 1924
CLK Colwick 13/06/1925
STR Stratford 01/07/1925
STR Stratford 30/11/1929
STR Southend Victoria   14/12/1929
STR Stratford 21/12/1929
MAR March 26/02/1940
NOR Norwich Thorpe 22/06/1947
STR Stratford 17/10/1947
SL South Lynn 26/11/1947
31B March 26/10/1952
40A Lincoln 13/09/1953
40B Immingham 10/10/1954
40F Boston 07/11/1954
34E New England 08/01/1961
   Withdrawn 15/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 22/06/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC SL South Lynn w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 04/12/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   15/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1916 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7267)
09/08/1924 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7685)
23/07/1927 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7550)
23/07/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
30/04/1932 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7456)
11/01/1936 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8863)
02/04/1938 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8843)
20/10/1945 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8980)
22/05/1947 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9152)
02/09/1949 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9151)
09/05/1953 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21185)
24/07/1955 Westinghouse Brake removed


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 11/03/1924 09/08/1924 152 days General
Altered to GE gauge
Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4652
 
Doncaster Works 13/04/1927 23/07/1927 102 days General
Westinghouse brake fitted
Boiler number 7550 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 16/02/1929 27/04/1929 71 days General  
Stratford Works 01/10/1930 17/12/1930 78 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 19/03/1932 30/04/1932 43 days General
Boiler number 7456 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 20/05/1933 08/07/1933 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/02/1934 24/03/1934 50 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/12/1935 11/01/1936 36 days General
Boiler number 8863 (Diagram 3)
 
Stratford Works 26/03/1936 06/04/1936 12 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1938 02/04/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 04/06/1938 18/06/1938 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 22/02/1941 22/03/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1941 04/04/1941 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 20/03/1943 10/04/1943 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1943 17/07/1943 36 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 19/06/1944 27/07/1944 39 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 09/09/1945 20/10/1945 42 days General
Boiler number 8980 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/02/1947 22/05/1947 93 days General
Boiler number 9152 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 26/10/1947 08/11/1947 14 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 31/05/1949 02/09/1949 95 days General
Boiler number 9151 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61742
 
Cowlairs Works 27/01/1950 25/02/1950 30 days Heavy Casual  
Cowlairs Works 05/03/1950 09/03/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 05/07/1951 23/08/1951 50 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 27/03/1953 09/05/1953 44 days General
Boiler number 21185 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/05/1955 24/07/1955 62 days Heavy Intermediate
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 03/08/1955 04/08/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 20/08/1958 20/09/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 9475 (Diagram 3)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1907 Allocation Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR)    
05/1916 To Service To service as GNR Number 1652
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1469
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
04/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: 04/03/1921. Dep: 15/08/1921.    
1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
11/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Altered to GE gauge
Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4652
   
13/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
13/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake fitted
Boiler number 7550 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929.    
30/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
14/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR)    
21/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
01/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1930. Dep: 17/12/1930.    
19/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7456 (Diagram 3)
   
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933.    
03/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934.    
07/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1935. Dep: 11/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8863 (Diagram 3)
   
26/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1936. Dep: 06/04/1936.    
26/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3)
   
04/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.    
26/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.    
29/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 04/04/1941.    
20/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.    
12/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943.    
19/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1944. Dep: 27/07/1944.    
09/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8980 (Diagram 3)
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1742    
19/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1947. Dep: 22/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9152 (Diagram 3)
   
22/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
17/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
26/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947.    
26/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (SL)    
31/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9151 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61742
   
27/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950.    
05/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1950. Dep: 09/03/1950.    
05/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951.    
26/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21185 (Diagram 3)
   
13/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
10/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
24/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1955. Dep: 24/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
03/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1955. Dep: 04/08/1955.    
20/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9475 (Diagram 3)
   
08/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
15/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61742 from New England (34E)    

prev prev