Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1653 m/e 06/1916
LNER (1924) 4653   12/02/1925
LNER (1946) 1743   19/05/1946
BR 61743   29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/106/1916
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 281
Works Number 1468
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1916 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Mon 22/06/1959 off Boston (40F)
Scrapping During y/e 1959
Service Life 43 yrs , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Matherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw, 28/10/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) m/e 06/1916
STR Stratford 10/04/1926
CAM Cambridge 07/01/1927
MAR March 04/06/1928
CAM Cambridge 23/07/1928
MAR March 03/05/1929
NOR Norwich Thorpe 09/10/1935
MAR March 07/11/1935
NOR Norwich Thorpe 22/06/1947
STR Stratford 17/10/1947
SL South Lynn 26/11/1947
31B March 02/11/1951
40A Lincoln 13/09/1953
40F Boston 13/02/1955
   Withdrawn 22/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 22/06/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC SL South Lynn w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 31B March w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 26/02/1955
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   22/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1916 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7268)
19/01/1924 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7261)
10/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
14/11/1928 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7461)
08/06/1935 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8843)
03/10/1942 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8840)
11/03/1950 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8560)
17/12/1955 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21122)
17/12/1955 Westinghouse Brake removed


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 07/11/1923 19/01/1924 74 days General
As 1653N. Altered to GE gauge
Boiler number 7261 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 29/12/1925 26/03/1926 88 days General  
Stratford Works 07/07/1927 02/11/1927 119 days Unclassified
Westinghouse brake ftted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 28/08/1928 14/11/1928 79 days General
Boiler number 7461 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 03/01/1931 07/02/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/09/1933 04/11/1933 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/05/1935 08/06/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 13/02/1937 13/03/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1937 11/12/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 9073 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 08/06/1940 29/06/1940 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/08/1942 03/10/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 8840 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/12/1944 10/02/1945 50 days General  
Cowlairs Works 12/03/1947 15/05/1947 65 days General  
Cowlairs Works 23/09/1947 25/10/1947 33 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 27/04/1948 29/05/1948 33 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61743
 
Cowlairs Works 26/01/1950 11/03/1950 45 days General
Boiler number 8560 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 15/07/1951 01/09/1951 49 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 11/10/1953 21/11/1953 42 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 17/11/1955 17/12/1955 31 days General
Boiler number 21122 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 21/12/1955 24/12/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 17/01/1956 21/01/1956 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1916 To Service To service as GNR Number 1653
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1468
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
24/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: 24/02/1921. Dep: 01/09/1921.    
07/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
As 1653N. Altered to GE gauge
Boiler number 7261 (Diagram 3)
   
12/02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4653    
29/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1925. Dep: 26/03/1926.    
10/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
07/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
07/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1927. Dep: 02/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake ftted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
04/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
23/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
28/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1928. Dep: 14/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7461 (Diagram 3)
   
03/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
03/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1931. Dep: 07/02/1931.    
30/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933.    
11/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3)
   
09/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
07/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.    
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9073 (Diagram 3)
   
08/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.    
29/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8840 (Diagram 3)
   
23/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 10/02/1945.    
19/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1743    
12/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1947. Dep: 15/05/1947.    
22/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
23/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.    
17/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
26/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (SL)    
27/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61743
   
26/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1950. Dep: 11/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8560 (Diagram 3)
   
15/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.    
02/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
13/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953.    
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
17/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21122 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
21/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.    
17/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1956. Dep: 21/01/1956.    
22/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61743 from Boston (40F)    

prev prev