Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1655 m/e 10/1916
LNER (1924) 4655   14/03/1925
LNER (1946) 1745   29/12/1946
BR 61745   11/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/110/1916
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 281
Works Number 1471
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1916 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Fri 25/11/1960 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into DO for cut up 25/11/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) m/e 10/1916
DON Doncaster 29/10/1925
CAM Cambridge 20/10/1927
STR Stratford 12/01/1928
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 10/10/1928
NOR Norwich Thorpe 31/12/1928
MAR March 03/03/1930
NOR Norwich Thorpe 17/10/1935
LOW Lowestoft 05/11/1939
NOR Norwich Thorpe 10/12/1939
MAR March 25/05/1944
NOR Norwich Thorpe 06/12/1946
LOW Lowestoft 26/03/1947
STR Stratford 22/10/1947
40A Lincoln 05/10/1952
40F Boston 15/03/1953
40B Immingham 01/03/1959
   Withdrawn 25/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 06/12/1946
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft 26/03/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   25/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1916 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7264)
26/03/1927 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7465)
15/10/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
06/10/1928 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7602)
23/03/1935 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8825)
02/03/1940 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9197)
10/10/1942 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9346)
02/05/1946 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9345)
07/11/1947 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8981)
01/12/1951 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21138)
10/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed
25/12/1954 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21162)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 02/11/1921 18/03/1922 137 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1924 14/03/1925 108 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4655
 
Doncaster Works 03/12/1925 02/01/1926 31 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/12/1926 26/03/1927 110 days General
Altered to GE gauge
Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 03/09/1927 15/10/1927 43 days Light Repair
Westinghouse brake ftted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 06/07/1928 06/10/1928 93 days General
Boiler number 7602 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 18/10/1930 22/11/1930 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/05/1933 10/06/1933 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/02/1935 23/03/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 8825 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 26/06/1937 24/07/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/02/1940 02/03/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 23/11/1940 14/12/1940 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 05/09/1942 10/10/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 9346 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 14/03/1944 29/04/1944 47 days General
Boiler number 9008 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 17/08/1944 16/09/1944 31 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 15/12/1944 26/01/1945 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 05/02/1946 02/05/1946 87 days General
Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 11/08/1947 07/11/1947 89 days General
Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 09/05/1948 11/07/1948 64 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61745
 
Cowlairs Works 12/02/1950 18/03/1950 35 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 10/08/1951 01/12/1951 114 days General
Boiler number 21138 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/11/1954 25/12/1954 37 days General
Boiler number 9199 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 11/01/1955 29/01/1955 19 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1957 19/10/1957 31 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1916 To Service To service as GNR Number 1655
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1471
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
02/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1921. Dep: 18/03/1922.    
27/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1924. Dep: 14/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4655
   
29/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1925. Dep: 02/01/1926.    
07/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1926. Dep: 26/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Altered to GE gauge
Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3)
   
03/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake ftted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
20/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
12/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
06/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7602 (Diagram 3)
   
10/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
31/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
03/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.    
06/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 10/06/1933.    
16/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8825 (Diagram 3)
   
17/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.    
05/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
10/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
03/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3)
   
23/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.    
05/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9346 (Diagram 3)
   
14/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9008 (Diagram 3)
   
25/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
17/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944.    
15/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1944. Dep: 26/01/1945.    
05/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1946. Dep: 02/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3)
   
06/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
29/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1745    
26/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
11/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3)
   
22/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
09/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1948. Dep: 11/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61745
   
12/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950.    
10/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21138 (Diagram 3)
   
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
15/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
10/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
19/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9199 (Diagram 3)
   
11/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 29/01/1955.    
19/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957.    
01/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61745 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev