|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1922 | 07/10/1922 | 130 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1924 | 17/01/1925 | 160 days | General | Boiler number 7252 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4660 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1925 | 25/08/1925 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1926 | 22/07/1926 | 143 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1926 | 18/08/1926 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1927 | 24/06/1927 | 63 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1928 | 16/06/1928 | 85 days | General | Altered to GE gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1928 | 02/02/1929 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 7260 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1931 | 13/02/1932 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1935 | 14/12/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1938 | 19/11/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 21l52 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1940 | 11/01/1941 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1944 | 08/04/1944 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9349 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/02/1945 | 21/03/1945 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/10/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 69 days | General | Boiler number CI786 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1948 | 17/12/1948 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 9346 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61750 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1950 | 28/10/1950 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1953 | 30/01/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1953 | 10/01/1953 | -238 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21144 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1907 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1660 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21971 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922. | ||
11/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7252 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4660 |
||
13/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1925. Dep: 25/08/1925. | ||
02/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1926. Dep: 22/07/1926. | ||
04/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1926. Dep: 18/08/1926. | ||
23/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 24/06/1927. | ||
24/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge |
||
28/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7260 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
31/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 13/02/1932. | ||
31/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. | ||
01/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
10/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935. | ||
20/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. | ||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21l52 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. | ||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941. | ||
22/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. | ||
19/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. | ||
25/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. | ||
21/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9349 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1945. Dep: 21/03/1945. | ||
06/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1750 | ||
21/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number CI786 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1948. Dep: 17/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9346 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61750 |
||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
14/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/09/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950. | ||
10/01/1953 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 21118 boiler fitted | ||
10/01/1953 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 8825 boiler fitted | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 30/01/1953. | ||
06/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1953. Dep: 10/01/1953. | ||
28/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21144 (Diagram 3) |
||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61750 from Boston (40F) |