|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1922 | 07/10/1922 | 130 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1924 | 12/12/1924 | 122 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4661 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1926 | 18/01/1927 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 7470 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1928 | 15/11/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 7603 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1931 | 19/12/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7256 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1933 | 03/02/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8558 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1935 | 11/05/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1941 | 29/11/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1942 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1944 | 08/04/1944 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 21170 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1945 | 02/02/1946 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/07/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/01/1950 | 03/03/1950 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 21114 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61751 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1952 | 15/07/1952 | 65 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1952 | 19/12/1952 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/12/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1954 | 31/12/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1661 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21972 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1924. Dep: 12/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4661 |
||
21/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1926. Dep: 18/01/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7470 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1928. Dep: 15/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7603 (Diagram 3) |
||
29/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7256 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 03/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8558 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935. | ||
04/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
14/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
09/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
02/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
20/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. | ||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. | ||
30/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941. | ||
08/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/08/1942. | ||
16/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21170 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. | ||
19/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
23/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1751 | ||
17/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1950. Dep: 03/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21114 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61751 |
||
12/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 15/07/1952. | ||
12/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1952. Dep: 19/12/1952. | ||
15/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
08/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. | ||
29/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 31/12/1954. | ||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
23/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61751 from Boston (40F) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |