|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1922 | 22/07/1922 | 144 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1924 | 14/02/1925 | 187 days | General | Boiler number 7269 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4662 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1926 | 10/03/1927 | 147 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1927 | 01/10/1927 | 29 days | Light Repair | Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1931 | 14/11/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7611 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1934 | 05/01/1935 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 9192 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1947 | 10/09/1947 | 116 days | General | Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/10/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 21120 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61752 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | Westinghouse brake removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 21166 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/02/1956 | 31/03/1956 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1662 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21973 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1922. Dep: 22/07/1922. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7269 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4662 |
||
21/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
15/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1926. Dep: 10/03/1927. | ||
03/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
06/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
16/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. | ||
30/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
14/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
14/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
21/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
17/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7611 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935. | ||
19/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. | ||
13/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. | ||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9192 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
21/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. | ||
20/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. | ||
08/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1752 | ||
18/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1947. Dep: 10/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. | ||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21120 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61752 |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
09/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake removed |
||
06/1953 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. | ||
07/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21166 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 31/03/1956. | ||
11/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61752 from Colwick (40E) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |