Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 2 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5346 Week
» 6236 Month
» 314217 Year
» 1198598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1662 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 4662   14/02/1925
LNER (1946) 1752   31/03/1946
BR 61752   09/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/106/1918
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L698
Works Number 21973
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1918 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Fri 11/12/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into ST for cut up 1/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 06/1918
DON Doncaster m/e 1923
ARD Ardsley 21/02/1925
STR Stratford 06/10/1927
STR Southend Victoria   30/11/1929
STR Stratford 14/12/1929
STR Southend Victoria   14/06/1930
STR Stratford 21/06/1930
MAR March 25/04/1940
NOR Norwich Thorpe 13/01/1946
STR Stratford 17/10/1947
38A Colwick 05/10/1952
   Withdrawn 11/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   11/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7453)
14/02/1925 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7269)
01/10/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
14/11/1931 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7611)
27/05/1939 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9192)
15/09/1945 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7624)
10/09/1947 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8862)
09/09/1950 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8840)
06/1953 Westinghouse Brake removed
05/11/1955 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21166)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/03/1922 22/07/1922 144 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/08/1924 14/02/1925 187 days General
Boiler number 7269 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4662
 
Doncaster Works 15/10/1926 10/03/1927 147 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/09/1927 01/10/1927 29 days Light Repair
Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 16/03/1929 04/05/1929 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1931 14/11/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 7611 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 17/11/1934 05/01/1935 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/09/1936 17/10/1936 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/03/1937 24/04/1937 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 25/03/1939 27/05/1939 64 days General
Boiler number 9192 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 21/06/1941 19/07/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1943 20/03/1943 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 08/08/1945 15/09/1945 39 days General
Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 18/05/1947 10/09/1947 116 days General
Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 22/10/1947 14/11/1947 24 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/06/1950 09/09/1950 82 days General
Boiler number 8840 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61752
 
Cowlairs Works 09/05/1953 30/05/1953 22 days Light Intermediate
Westinghouse brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 11/01/1954 06/03/1954 55 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 07/09/1955 05/11/1955 60 days General
Boiler number 21166 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/02/1956 31/03/1956 37 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as GNR Number 1662
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21973
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1922. Dep: 22/07/1922.    
1923 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7269 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4662
   
21/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
15/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1926. Dep: 10/03/1927.    
03/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
06/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.    
30/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR)    
14/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
14/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR)    
21/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7611 (Diagram 3)
   
17/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935.    
19/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.    
13/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.    
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9192 (Diagram 3)
   
25/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
21/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941.    
20/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.    
08/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3)
   
13/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1752    
18/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1947. Dep: 10/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3)
   
17/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
22/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947.    
20/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8840 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61752
   
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
09/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake removed
   
06/1953 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
11/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954.    
07/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21166 (Diagram 3)
   
24/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 31/03/1956.    
11/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61752 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev