Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1663 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 4663   20/12/1924
LNER (1946) 1753   13/10/1946
BR (Tmp) E1753   20/02/1948
BR 61753   27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/107/1918
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L698
Works Number 21974
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 07/1918 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 28/09/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw 2/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 07/1918
ARD Ardsley m/e 1923
STR Stratford 03/11/1927
CAM Cambridge 18/01/1929
NWE New England 05/03/1929
MAR March 17/10/1929
NWE New England 31/12/1929
NOR Norwich Thorpe 24/09/1930
LOW Lowestoft 04/10/1930
NWE New England 09/01/1931
NOR Norwich Thorpe 06/08/1932
LOW Lowestoft 02/10/1932
NOR Norwich Thorpe 15/01/1933
LOW Lowestoft 06/10/1934
NOR Norwich Thorpe 03/11/1934
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 21/11/1934
NOR Norwich Thorpe 15/12/1934
LOW Lowestoft 05/10/1935
NOR Norwich Thorpe 17/12/1935
LOW Lowestoft 04/10/1936
NOR Norwich Thorpe 24/01/1937
MAR March 22/02/1945
NOR Norwich Thorpe 13/01/1946
STR Stratford 22/10/1947
38A Colwick 05/10/1952
   Withdrawn 28/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   28/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7454)
19/10/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
19/01/1929 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7610)
23/04/1932 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7258)
23/06/1934 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8561)
08/01/1938 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8862)
03/06/1939 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9193)
10/07/1945 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9009)
19/07/1947 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8869)
20/09/1951 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21165)
20/03/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed
02/06/1955 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21171)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/07/1922 21/10/1922 113 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/09/1924 20/12/1924 84 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4663
 
Doncaster Works 10/02/1927 12/05/1927 92 days Light Repair
Westinghouse pump only fitted
 
Doncaster Works 08/10/1927 19/10/1927 12 days Light Repair
Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake completed
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 08/11/1928 19/01/1929 73 days General
Boiler number 7610 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 15/02/1930 29/03/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/03/1932 23/04/1932 43 days General
Boiler number 7258 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 19/05/1934 23/06/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 8561 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 14/03/1936 04/04/1936 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/12/1937 08/01/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 22/04/1939 03/06/1939 43 days General
Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 12/09/1942 10/10/1942 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 25/06/1944 05/08/1944 42 days General  
Cowlairs Works 23/05/1945 10/07/1945 49 days General
Boiler number 9009 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 06/09/1946 27/10/1946 52 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1753
 
Cowlairs Works 24/03/1947 19/07/1947 118 days General
Boiler number 8869 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/09/1947 12/10/1947 20 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/01/1948 20/02/1948 37 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1753
 
Cowlairs Works 21/07/1949 27/08/1949 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 61753
 
Cowlairs Works 04/07/1951 20/09/1951 79 days General
Boiler number 21165 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 16/02/1954 20/03/1954 33 days Heavy Intermediate
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 25/04/1955 02/06/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 21171 (Diagram 3)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as GNR Number 1663
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21974
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
01/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1922. Dep: 21/10/1922.    
1923 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
28/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4663
   
10/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1927. Dep: 12/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse pump only fitted
   
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 19/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake completed
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
03/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
08/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7610 (Diagram 3)
   
18/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
05/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
17/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
31/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
15/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930.    
24/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
04/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
09/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
12/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7258 (Diagram 3)
   
06/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
02/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
15/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
19/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8561 (Diagram 3)
   
06/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
03/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
21/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
15/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
05/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
17/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936.    
04/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
24/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
25/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3)
   
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3)
   
12/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.    
25/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944.    
22/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
23/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1945. Dep: 10/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9009 (Diagram 3)
   
13/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
06/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1946. Dep: 27/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1753
   
24/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8869 (Diagram 3)
   
23/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1947. Dep: 12/10/1947.    
22/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
15/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1753
   
21/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61753
   
04/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21165 (Diagram 3)
   
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 02/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21171 (Diagram 3)
   
28/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61753 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev