Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1671 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 4671   10/10/1925
LNER (1946) 1761   02/06/1946
BR 61761   11/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/106/1918
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L699
Works Number 21982
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1918 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Thu 19/01/1961 off Kings Cross (34A)
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into DO for cut up 19/1/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) m/e 06/1918
DON Doncaster 04/11/1925
CAM Cambridge 23/05/1928
MAR March 04/06/1928
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 24/09/1929
MAR March 20/12/1929
CAM Cambridge 21/10/1936
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/10/1938
MAR March 18/02/1945
COL Colchester 13/01/1946
STR Stratford 25/09/1947
COL Colchester 01/02/1948
STR Stratford 16/05/1948
40A Lincoln 05/10/1952
40F Boston 13/02/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall 10/07/1955
34A Kings Cross 08/01/1961
   Withdrawn 19/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 25/09/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 22/05/1948
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 16/07/1955
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   19/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7462)
10/10/1925 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7260)
05/01/1928 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7456)
16/04/1928 Westinghouse Brake fitted
10/01/1931 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7683)
22/10/1932 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7607)
01/09/1945 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9197)
11/03/1949 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9473)
17/04/1954 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21141)
17/04/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed
06/09/1958 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21159)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 02/11/1921 05/11/1921 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/06/1923 29/09/1923 116 days General
As 1671N
 
Doncaster Works 29/06/1925 10/10/1925 104 days General
Boiler number 7260 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4671
 
Doncaster Works 15/10/1927 05/01/1928 83 days General
Boiler number 7456 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 03/04/1928 16/04/1928 14 days Light Repair
Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 13/12/1930 10/01/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 7683 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 24/09/1932 22/10/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 7607 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 24/11/1934 05/01/1935 43 days General
Boiler number 8824 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 26/01/1935 09/02/1935 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1936 02/05/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1937 04/12/1937 8 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/06/1940 13/07/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 9200 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 02/11/1940 03/01/1941 63 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1943 04/09/1943 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 15/07/1945 01/09/1945 49 days General
Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3)
 
Stratford Works 29/01/1946 09/02/1946 12 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 28/12/1948 11/03/1949 74 days General
Boiler number 9473 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61761
 
Cowlairs Works 20/11/1951 26/01/1952 68 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 28/02/1954 17/04/1954 49 days General
Boiler number 21141 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 21/05/1954 03/06/1954 14 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 24/06/1954 20/08/1954 58 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 27/10/1954 27/11/1954 32 days C/I  
Cowlairs Works 13/08/1958 06/09/1958 25 days General
Boiler number 9196 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 08/01/1961   No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as GNR Number 1671
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21982
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
02/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921.    
06/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1923. Dep: 29/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
As 1671N
   
29/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7260 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4671
   
04/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 05/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7456 (Diagram 3)
   
03/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1928. Dep: 16/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
23/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
04/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
20/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 10/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7683 (Diagram 3)
   
24/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7607 (Diagram 3)
   
24/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8824 (Diagram 3)
   
26/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935.    
28/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936.    
21/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937.    
01/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9200 (Diagram 3)
   
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 03/01/1941.    
07/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.    
18/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
15/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3)
   
13/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
29/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1761    
25/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
01/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
16/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
28/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1948. Dep: 11/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9473 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61761
   
20/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 26/01/1952.    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
28/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21141 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
21/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 03/06/1954.    
24/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954.    
27/10/1954 Works Visit      
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
10/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
13/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 06/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9196 (Diagram 3)
   
08/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
08/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/01/1961.    
19/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61761 from Kings Cross (34A)    

prev prev