Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 1019 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3118 Week
» 14689 Month
» 262982 Year
» 1147363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1674 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 4674   13/03/1926
LNER (1946) 1764   02/06/1946
BR 61764   08/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1933 LOCH ARKAIG

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/107/1918
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L699
Works Number 21985
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 07/1918 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Thu 07/09/1961 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 43 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into CO for cut up 1/12/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) m/e 07/1918
STR Stratford m/e 03/1924
CAM Cambridge 04/01/1927
STR Stratford 03/11/1928
STR Southend Victoria   15/03/1930
STR Stratford 22/03/1930
EFD Eastfield 11/12/1931
STM St Margarets 07/08/1938
EFD Eastfield 07/12/1942
   Withdrawn 07/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   07/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7465)
13/03/1926 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7263)
07/11/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
03/11/1928 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7549)
11/1931 Westinghouse Brake removed
21/11/1931 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7606)
18/05/1946 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9194)
05/05/1956 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21145)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 15/10/1921 05/11/1921 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/08/1923 08/12/1923 100 days General
New chimney to GE gauge
 
Doncaster Works 21/12/1925 13/03/1926 83 days General
Boiler number 7263 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4674
 
Doncaster Works 16/03/1926 27/03/1926 12 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 1927 07/11/1927   Light Repair
Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 17/09/1928 03/11/1928 48 days General
Westinghouse brake removed
Boiler number 7549 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 1932 07/04/1932   General  
Cowlairs Works 1934 03/05/1934   General
Speed indicator of cab altered & drop grate fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 1935 21/12/1935   General  
Cowlairs Works 26/06/1937 10/08/1937 46 days General  
Cowlairs Works 1939 26/01/1939   General  
Cowlairs Works 1939 01/05/1939   Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 1940 06/07/1940   General  
Cowlairs Works 28/02/1942 28/03/1942 29 days General
Boiler number 8842 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 1943 28/08/1943   General  
Cowlairs Works 1945 20/04/1945   Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 1946 17/10/1946   Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1764
 
Cowlairs Works 08/04/1946 18/05/1946 41 days General
Boiler number 9194 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 1947 02/07/1947   Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 28/09/1947 20/11/1947 54 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 1949 08/01/1949   Light Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 61764
 
Cowlairs Works 1950 07/01/1950   Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 1950 07/10/1950   Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 01/05/1950 24/06/1950 55 days General  
Cowlairs Works 24/09/1952 18/10/1952 25 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 06/05/1954 26/06/1954 52 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 08/07/1954 15/07/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/08/1954 21/08/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1955 21/09/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/03/1956 05/05/1956 48 days General
Boiler number 9011 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/04/1958 24/05/1958 31 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as GNR Number 1674
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21985
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
15/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921.    
31/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
New chimney to GE gauge
   
03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
21/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 13/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7263 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4674
   
16/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926.    
1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1927. Dep: 07/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake fitted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
04/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
17/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake removed
Boiler number 7549 (Diagram 3)
   
03/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
15/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR)    
22/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
11/1931 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
21/11/1931 Modification Diagram 3 number 7606 boiler fitted    
21/11/1931 Modification Diagram 3 number C1788 boiler fitted    
11/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: 07/04/1932.    
03/1933 Naming Named 'LOCH ARKAIG'    
1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 03/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Speed indicator of cab altered & drop grate fitted
   
1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935.    
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/08/1937.    
07/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 26/01/1939.    
1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 01/05/1939.    
1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.    
28/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8842 (Diagram 3)
   
07/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.    
1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 20/04/1945.    
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 17/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1764
   
08/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9194 (Diagram 3)
   
1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 02/07/1947.    
28/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947.    
1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61764
   
1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1950. Dep: 07/01/1950.    
1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950.    
01/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950.    
24/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.    
06/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.    
08/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 15/07/1954.    
19/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954.    
19/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 21/09/1955.    
19/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9011 (Diagram 3)
   
24/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958.    
07/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61764 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev