|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1920 | 30/10/1920 | 82 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1922 | 18/07/1922 | 100 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1923 | 10/02/1923 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1924 | 15/11/1924 | 143 days | General | Boiler number 7687 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4675 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1925 | 28/11/1925 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 104 days | General | Westinghouse pump fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1927 | 03/09/1927 | 27 days | Light Repair | Westinghouse brake completed Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7454 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1932 | 27/02/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7840 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1942 | 07/02/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/01/1945 | 14/02/1945 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 21174 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1948 | 19/02/1949 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 9192 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61765 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1950 | 12/10/1950 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 26/10/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 21178 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 45 days | Light Intermediate | Westinghouse Brake removed |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1675 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21986 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
10/08/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1920. Dep: 30/10/1920. | ||
10/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1922. Dep: 18/07/1922. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1923. Dep: 10/02/1923. | ||
26/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7687 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4675 |
||
05/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925. | ||
17/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse pump fitted |
||
08/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake completed Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
02/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7454 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932. | ||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. | ||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7840 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1942. Dep: 07/02/1942. | ||
09/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. | ||
02/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1945. Dep: 14/02/1945. | ||
13/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21174 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1765 | ||
25/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
06/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9192 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61765 |
||
01/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950. | ||
26/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. | ||
20/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21178 (Diagram 3) |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/05/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61765 from Boston (40F) |