Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1676 m/e 08/1918
LNER (1924) 4676   26/09/1925
LNER (1946) 1766   16/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E1766   18/02/1948
BR 61766   13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/108/1918
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L699
Works Number 21987
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1918 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Mon 23/01/1961 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into DO for cut up 25/1/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) m/e 08/1918
MAR March m/e 1924
CAM Cambridge m/e 1925
KX Kings Cross 15/08/1925
DON Doncaster 23/10/1925
CAM Cambridge 15/10/1927
STR Stratford 07/01/1928
DON Doncaster 14/06/1929
LOW Lowestoft 17/09/1929
DON Doncaster 31/12/1929
MAR March 21/06/1931
DON Doncaster 09/09/1931
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 03/10/1931
NOR Norwich Thorpe 26/03/1933
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 09/10/1934
LOW Lowestoft 03/11/1934
NOR Norwich Thorpe 28/12/1934
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 04/10/1936
NOR Norwich Thorpe 24/01/1937
MAR March 24/02/1940
COL Colchester 12/01/1946
SL South Lynn 04/04/1948
40F Boston 29/06/1952
62A Thornton Junction 25/01/1953
40F Boston 25/03/1953
40B Immingham 01/03/1959
40E Colwick 12/06/1960
   Withdrawn 23/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 3w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   25/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7467)
26/09/1925 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7466)
15/10/1927 Westinghouse Brake fitted
15/06/1929 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7465)
24/02/1934 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8560)
17/06/1939 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7837)
07/04/1944 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9347)
31/05/1946 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8561)
27/11/1954 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21169)
27/11/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed
30/08/1958 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21136)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 02/10/1922 18/11/1922 48 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/03/1923 01/11/1923 235 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1925 26/09/1925 107 days General
Boiler number 7466 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4676
 
Doncaster Works 06/03/1926 10/04/1926 36 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/12/1926 21/05/1927 162 days General
Altered to GE gauge
 
Doncaster Works 08/10/1927 15/10/1927 8 days Light Repair
Westinghouse brake jtted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 11/05/1929 15/06/1929 36 days General
H A at front fitted
Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 21/02/1931 21/03/1931 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/01/1934 24/02/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 8560 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 21/09/1935 19/10/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/04/1937 24/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 9008 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 13/05/1939 17/06/1939 36 days General
Boiler number 7837 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 13/09/1941 18/10/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/11/1941 27/12/1941 29 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 01/03/1944 07/04/1944 38 days General
Boiler number 9347 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 22/11/1944 23/12/1944 32 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 22/03/1946 31/05/1946 71 days General
Boiler number 8561 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 30/01/1948 18/02/1948 20 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1766
 
Cowlairs Works 15/05/1949 13/08/1949 91 days General
Renumbered to BR 61766
 
Cowlairs Works 29/04/1950 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 17/11/1952 17/01/1953 62 days Light Intermediate  
Stratford Works 17/09/1953 26/09/1953 10 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 20/10/1954 27/11/1954 39 days General
Westinghouse brake removed
Boiler number 9347 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 04/08/1958 30/08/1958 27 days General
Boiler number 21136 (Diagram 3)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as GNR Number 1676
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21987
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
02/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922.    
12/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1923. Dep: 01/11/1923.    
1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
1925 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
12/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7466 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4676
   
15/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
23/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926.    
11/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 21/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Altered to GE gauge
   
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake jtted
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
15/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
07/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
11/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
H A at front fitted
Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3)
   
14/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
31/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.    
21/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
26/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
20/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8560 (Diagram 3)
   
09/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
03/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
28/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935.    
04/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
24/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
10/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9008 (Diagram 3)
   
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7837 (Diagram 3)
   
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.    
29/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941.    
01/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9347 (Diagram 3)
   
22/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944.    
12/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
22/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1946. Dep: 31/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8561 (Diagram 3)
   
16/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1766    
30/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1948. Dep: 18/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1766
   
04/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (SL)    
15/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61766
   
29/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1950.    
29/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
17/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953.    
25/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
25/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
17/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953.    
20/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake removed
Boiler number 9347 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
04/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21136 (Diagram 3)
   
01/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61766 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev