Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 987 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18790 Week
» 71806 Month
» 191333 Year
» 3218186 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1683 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4683 |
|
15/03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1773 |
|
17/11/1946 |
British Railways (BR Tmp) |
E1773 |
|
12/03/1948 |
British Railways |
61773 |
|
24/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
Order Number |
492T |
Works Number |
5333 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1921 to New England (NWE) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 23/12/1960 off Colwick (40E) |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
Notes
Notes |
Into DO for cut up 23/12/60 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1921 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7604) |
21/11/1928 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7470) |
06/12/1930 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7942) |
03/12/1932 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7264) |
29/09/1934 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8759) |
29/08/1944 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7837) |
18/05/1946 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9474) |
04/10/1952 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21147) |
29/01/1955 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21111) |
19/04/1958 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21187) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1683 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5333 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4683 |
|
|
21/11/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7470 boiler fitted |
|
|
21/11/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number C1786 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/12/1930 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7942 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/12/1932 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7264 boiler fitted |
|
|
29/09/1934 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21114 boiler fitted |
|
|
29/09/1934 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 8759 boiler fitted |
|
|
13/10/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
26/10/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
20/08/1938 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21151 boiler fitted |
|
|
20/08/1938 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 9150 boiler fitted |
|
|
29/08/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7837 boiler fitted |
|
|
18/05/1946 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 9474 boiler fitted |
|
|
17/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1773 |
|
|
12/03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E1773 |
|
|
24/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61773 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21147 boiler fitted |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21111 boiler fitted |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 8561 boiler fitted |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21187 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
01/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
23/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61773 from Colwick (40E) |
|
|