|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1922 | 29/04/1922 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 86 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1924 | 26/03/1925 | 102 days | General | Boiler number 7267 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4686 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1925 | 15/09/1925 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1925 | 10/10/1925 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1926 | 15/05/1926 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1927 | 25/06/1927 | 104 days | General | Boiler number 7463 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1928 | 11/05/1928 | 60 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1928 | 24/11/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1930 | 05/07/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1931 | 07/05/1931 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1931 | 09/01/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7269 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 07/07/1932 | Unknown Regime | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 29/11/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted Boiler number Cl828 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 02/05/1936 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 13/09/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 10/1937 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 26/10/1938 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 13/07/1940 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 02/09/1940 | 05/10/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 01/1942 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 09/04/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 08/08/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 16/09/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 20/08/1943 | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 11/1945 | Light Repair | Snowplough fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1945 | 09/08/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/09/1947 | 01/11/1947 | 51 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/09/1949 | 02/12/1949 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61776 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/03/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 21180 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1686 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5336 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
26/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1922. Dep: 29/04/1922. | ||
19/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. | ||
15/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1924. Dep: 26/03/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7267 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4686 |
||
28/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1925. Dep: 15/09/1925. | ||
29/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925. | ||
11/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1926. Dep: 15/05/1926. | ||
14/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7463 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1928. Dep: 11/05/1928. | ||
29/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928. | ||
31/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930. | ||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 07/05/1931. | ||
05/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1931. Dep: 09/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7269 (Diagram 3) |
||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: 07/07/1932. | ||
25/01/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 29/11/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted Boiler number Cl828 (Diagram 3) |
||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 13/09/1937. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: ?/10/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 26/10/1938. | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. | ||
02/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: ?/01/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 09/04/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 16/09/1942. | ||
10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 20/08/1943. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: ?/11/1945. Work undertaken: Snowplough fitted |
||
28/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1945. Dep: 09/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3) |
||
14/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1776 | ||
12/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/09/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947. | ||
12/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61776 |
||
14/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. | ||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. | ||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
04/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21180 (Diagram 3) |
||
15/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
23/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61776 from Eastfield (65A) |