Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1687 m/e 06/1921
LNER (1924) 4687   27/06/1925
LNER (1946) 1777   02/02/1946
BR 61777   26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K2/106/1921
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 492T
Works Number 5337
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1921 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 11/05/1959 off New England (34E)
Scrapping During y/e 1959
Service Life 37 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into DA for cut up 11/7/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) m/e 06/1921
STR Stratford 24/02/1928
LOW Lowestoft 10/12/1928
32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 23/01/1929
MAR March 01/03/1930
CAM Cambridge 04/10/1936
STR Stratford 01/10/1938
MAR March 26/04/1940
STR Stratford 12/01/1946
PKS Parkeston Quay 09/02/1946
STR Stratford 25/09/1947
38A Colwick 05/10/1952
35A New England 18/08/1957
   Withdrawn 11/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC STR Stratford 25/09/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 07/09/1957
WDN   11/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1921 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7608)
18/02/1928 Westinghouse Brake fitted
18/02/1928 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7264)
06/08/1932 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7610)
01/06/1935 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8840)
09/08/1941 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8823)
26/06/1948 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8758)
25/04/1953 Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21183)
08/1955 Westinghouse Brake removed


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/06/1921 29/06/1921 9 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/04/1922 22/04/1922 12 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/12/1922 27/04/1923 143 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/03/1925 27/06/1925 97 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4687
 
Doncaster Works 31/07/1925 14/08/1925 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 26/11/1925 12/12/1925 17 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/02/1926 18/03/1926 45 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 24/11/1927 18/02/1928 87 days General
Westinghouse brake fitted
Boiler number 7264 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Doncaster Works 04/08/1928 02/10/1928 60 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 19/07/1930 23/08/1930 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1932 06/08/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 7610 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 20/04/1935 01/06/1935 43 days General
Boiler number 8840 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 03/04/1937 01/05/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1939 04/11/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/07/1941 09/08/1941 36 days General
Boiler number 8823 (Diagram 3)
 
Doncaster Works 02/10/1943 30/10/1943 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 21/10/1945 01/12/1945 42 days General  
Cowlairs Works 21/04/1948 26/06/1948 67 days General
Boiler number 8758 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61777
 
Stratford Works 29/12/1949 03/03/1950 65 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 26/01/1951 10/03/1951 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/01/1952 28/03/1952 88 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 25/03/1953 25/04/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 21183 (Diagram 3)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/11/1953 05/12/1953 12 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 08/10/1954 06/11/1954 30 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 30/06/1955 13/08/1955 45 days Light Intermediate
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Cowlairs Works 13/09/1959 26/10/1959 44 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as GNR Number 1687
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5337
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 3 boiler fitted
   
21/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1921. Dep: 29/06/1921.    
11/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1922. Dep: 22/04/1922.    
06/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1922. Dep: 27/04/1923.    
23/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1925. Dep: 27/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4687
   
31/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1925. Dep: 14/08/1925.    
26/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.    
02/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1926. Dep: 18/03/1926.    
24/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse brake fitted
Boiler number 7264 (Diagram 3)
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
24/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
04/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 02/10/1928.    
10/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
23/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E)    
01/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
19/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.    
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7610 (Diagram 3)
   
20/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8840 (Diagram 3)
   
04/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937.    
01/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.    
26/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
05/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8823 (Diagram 3)
   
02/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.    
21/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.    
12/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
02/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1777    
09/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
25/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
21/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8758 (Diagram 3)
Renumbered to BR 61777
   
29/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1949. Dep: 03/03/1950.    
26/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951.    
01/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 28/03/1952.    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21183 (Diagram 3)
   
24/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.    
08/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.    
30/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/06/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
18/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
11/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61777 from New England (34E)    
13/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1959. Dep: 26/10/1959.    

prev prev