Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4327 Week
» 17360 Month
» 239761 Year
» 1124142 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1000 m/e 03/1920
LNER (1924) 4000 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 1800 m/e 05/1946
BR 61800 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1920
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1509
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1920
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 42 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster w/e 07/02/1959
   Withdrawn 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   13/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1920 To Service To service as GNR Number 1000
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1509
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4000    
07/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1800    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61800    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61800    

prev