Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 919 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3234 Week
» 31192 Month
» 65834 Year
» 1287399 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1001 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 4001 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 1801 m/e 08/1946
BR 61801 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K306/1920
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1513
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1920
Withdrawal Tue 17/04/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 41 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 5w/e 24/07/1954
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/10/1954
31B March 4w/e 16/02/1957
31A Cambridge w/e 12/12/1959
31B March w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn 17/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 12/10/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   17/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as GNR Number 1001
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1513
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4001    
03/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1801    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61801    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61801    

prev prev