Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3360 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16766 Week
» 69782 Month
» 189309 Year
» 3216162 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1001 |
m/e |
06/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4001 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1801 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61801 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
290 |
Works Number |
1513 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/04/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
12/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
5w/e |
09/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1933 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1001 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1513 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4001 |
|
|
03/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1801 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61801 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61801 |
|
|