Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1003 m/e 10/1920
LNER (1924) 4003 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 1803 m/e 12/1946
BR 61803 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1920
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 290
Works Number 1515
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Thu 13/07/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster w/e 07/02/1959
   Withdrawn 13/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   13/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1933 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as GNR Number 1003
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1515
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4003    
05/1933 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1803    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61803    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61803    

prev prev